Cyr, Priscille Marie Georgette (CPSO#: 94516)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hawkesbury and District
General Hospital
1111 rue Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3E5
Phone: (613) 632-1111
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Priscille Cyr Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 18 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Cyr ( CPSO# 94516 )

Business Address:
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3G5
Phone Number: (613) 632-1111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 10 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PRISCILLE MARIE GEORGETTE CYR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CYR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 18 Oct 2010 to 13 Nov 2010
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 13 Oct 2014 to 23 Nov 2014
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Nov 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Nov 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2015
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 25 Oct 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2016