Cytowski, Patricia Lorraine (CPSO#: 72554)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pinewood Medical Centre
1471 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5G 3H5
Phone: (905) 274-1475
Fax: (905) 274-4614
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICIA LORRAINE CYTOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CYTOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2000