Czarnecki, Jan Stanislaw Campbell (CPSO#: 21929)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jan S. Czarnecki Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 16 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS 111 St Regis Cres S North York, ON M3J 1Y6
Date Received: 15 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 01 Jan 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1969
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018