Czemerynski, Anne (CPSO#: 56183)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Four Villages Health Centre
1700 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6P 4C3
Phone: (416) 604-3361
Fax: (416) 604-3367
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Czemerynski-Szul Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Szul ( CPSO# 46641 )
Dr. A. Czemerynski ( CPSO# 56183 )

Business Address:
Ukrainian Canadian Care Centre
60 Richview Road
Toronto ON  M9A 5E4
Phone Number: (416) 243-7653

Business Address:
1700 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6P 4C3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE CZEMERYNSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CZEMERYNSKI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1986