Czolpinska, Elzbieta (CPSO#: 58743)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Warsaw, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Assertive Community Treatment Team
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7T1
Phone: (807) 684-7980
Fax: (807) 683 4360
Electoral District: 09

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Care Group,Lakehead Psychiatric Hospital Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 29 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELZBIETA CZOLPINSKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CZOLPINSKA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 1989