Li, David Sung-Ling (CPSO#: 85719)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Oct 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:Ross University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oshawa Clinic
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone: (905) 723-8551 Ext. 5298
Fax: (905) 721-6613
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Li Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Thassanapaff ( CPSO# 94847 )
Dr. D. Li ( CPSO# 85719 )

Business Address:
Oshawa Clinic
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 723-8551

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Oct 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID SUNG-LING LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Nov 2006 to 23 Jan 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 24 Jan 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Nov 2007 to 20 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2008