D'Souza, Sameer Dominic (CPSO#: 78485)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Dec 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health System
Etobicoke General Hospital Campus
101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 747-3400 Ext. 33530
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital Campus
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sameer D'Souza Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. S. D'Souza ( CPSO# 78485 )

Business Address:
20 Lynch Street
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 747-3530

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Aug 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMEER DOMINIC D'SOUZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. D'SOUZA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2002