DaSilva, Sean L (CPSO#: 90895)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Oct 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.L. DaSilva Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 25 2013

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Oct 2012