Daabak, Abdulghani Mohamed (CPSO#: 90388)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Apr 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Apr 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Vellore Medical Walk In
104-3737 Major Mackenzie Dr
Woodbridge ON  L4H 0A2
Phone: (905) 417-7771
Fax: (905) 417-1371
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABDULGHANI MOHAMED DAABAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAABAK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Apr 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Apr 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Mar 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Apr 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2012