Dahab-Abdo, Salim Towfeig (CPSO#: 85363)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:ZAGAZIG FACULTY OF MEDICINE, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 23 Sep 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009