Dahman, Jehad Jay (CPSO#: 79529)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 May 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 03 May 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: Dahman, Jehad (used until: 30 May 2005 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Damascus, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Downsview Pediatric Urgent Care
877 Wilson Ave., Unit 13
Toronto ON  M3K 1E6
Phone: 647-351-7337
Fax: 647-351-7339
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave.
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Canada
Phone: 416-242-1000
Fax: 416-242-1095
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dahman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 09 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Dahman ( CPSO# 79529 )

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Business Address:
Suite 13
877 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3K 1E6
Phone Number: (647) 351-7337

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 03 Aug 2005 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 08 Aug 2003
PEAP - Resident - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 09 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Jul 2005
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Apr 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 May 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Aug 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Oct 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Oct 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Sep 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Dec 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 23 Dec 2010 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Jehad Jay Dahman may practise medicine independently in paediatrics, only.