Daily, Robert Franklin (CPSO#: 30141)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 1293 Bunsden Avenue Mississauga ON L5H 2B3
Date Received: 24 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 12 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018