Daitchman, Julie Faith (CPSO#: 76417)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Feb 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1600 Steeles Ave. West, Unit 5
Concord ON  L4K 4M2
Phone: (905) 763-8660
Fax: (905) 763-0708
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 19 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIE FAITH DAITCHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAITCHMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2007