Dalal, Vikram (CPSO#: 76314)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:University of Calgary, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southwest Middlesex Health Centre
R R 5
22262 Mill Road
Mount Brydges ON  N0L 1W0
Phone: (519) 264-2800
Fax: (519) 264-2742
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vikram Dalal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Dalal ( CPSO# 76314 )

Business Address:
395 Carrie Street
Strathroy ON  N7G 3J4
Phone Number: (519) 245-1550

Business Address:
22262 Mill Road
RR 5
Mount Brydges ON  N0L 1W0
Phone Number: (519) 264-2800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIKRAM DALAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DALAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2003