Dallaire, Christine (CPSO#: 86267)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: Newell, Christine (used until: 20 Nov 2007 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Medical Centre
707 Charlotte St
Peterborough ON  K9J7B3
Phone: (705) 749-9695
Fax: (705) 743-1449
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dallaire Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 30 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dallaire ( CPSO# 86284 )
Dr. C. Dallaire ( CPSO# 86267 )

Business Address:
The Medical Centre
707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 7B3
Phone Number: (705) 749-9695

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Business Address:
The Medical Arts
201-270 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 2V4
Phone Number: (705) 743-0030

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 29 Dec 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE DALLAIRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DALLAIRE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 29 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 30 Dec 2011 to 29 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Dec 2012