Dallaire, Stephane Andre (CPSO#: 86284)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Feb 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
270 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 2V4
Phone: 705-743-0030
Fax: 705-743-0047
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dallaire Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 30 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dallaire ( CPSO# 86284 )
Dr. C. Dallaire ( CPSO# 86267 )

Business Address:
The Medical Centre
707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 7B3
Phone Number: (705) 749-9695

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Business Address:
The Medical Arts
201-270 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 2V4
Phone Number: (705) 743-0030

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 03 Nov 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHANE ANDRE DALLAIRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DALLAIRE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2010