Dally, Ghassan Youssef (CPSO#: 74715)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Mississauga Medical
3050 Argentia Rd
Mississauga ON  L5N 8E1
Phone: (905) 785 3627
Fax: (905) 785 3628
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. G. Dally Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 30 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Dally ( CPSO# 74715 )

Business Address:
West Mississauga Medical
3050 Argentia Road
Mississauga ON  L5N 8E1
Phone Number: (905) 785-3627

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GHASSAN YOUSSEF DALLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DALLY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2002