Daly, Joyce Louise (CPSO#: 63516)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 3
715 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7R1
Phone: (519) 622-5849
Fax: (519) 622-7392
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. L. Daly Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Daly ( CPSO# 63516 )

Business Address:
Coronation Health Centre
715 Coronation Boulevard
Unit 3
Cambridge ON  N1R 7R1
Phone Number: (519) 622-5849

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 17 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOYCE LOUISE DALY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DALY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1992