Daly, Meghan Tsering (CPSO#: 92644)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Anne Drive
Halton Hills
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone: (905) 873-0111 Ext. 8505
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

199 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G5Z7
Canada
Phone: 905-873-3000
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Meghan Daly Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 08 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Daly ( CPSO# 92644 )

Business Address:
Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Anne Drive
Halton Hills ON  L7G 2B8
Phone Number: (905) 873-0111

Business Address:
199 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 0E3
Phone Number: (807) 873-3600

Business Address:
524 1st Avenue South
Kenora ON  P9N 1W5
Phone Number: (807) 468-3600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEGHAN TSERING DALY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DALY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 12 Apr 2010 to 07 May 2010
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 May 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2010