Damaraju, Deepti (CPSO#: 90776)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Feb 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Feb 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Telugu

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mississauga Lung Health Centre
89 Queensway West
Suite 214
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone: 905 848 6079
Fax: 905 858 8835
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

150 Sherway Drive
Medical Clinics, 2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Canada
Phone: 416 521 4196
Fax: 416 521 4082
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Deepti Damaraju Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Damaraju ( CPSO# 90776 )

Business Address:
Mississauga Lung Health Centre
Suite 214
80 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone Number: (905) 848-6079

Business Address:
Medical Clinics
2nd Floor
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 521-4196

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 22 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEEPTI DAMARAJU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAMARAJU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 2015