Damji, Zumil (CPSO#: 86335)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Emergency Physicians Services
Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone: 6133453847
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zumil Damji Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Damji ( CPSO# 86335 )

Business Address:
Emergency Physicians Services
Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone Number: (613) 345-3847

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 03 Nov 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZUMIL DAMJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAMJI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2009