Dammermann, Scott (CPSO#: 62730)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Health Centre
2810 Major Mckenzie Drive
Maple ON  L6A 3L2
Phone: (905) 832-3838
Fax: (905) 832-9097
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SCOTT DAMMERMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAMMERMANN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1991