Danayan, Karoon Carole (CPSO#: 81007)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Armenian, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100
235 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 1N2
Phone: (416) 466-1311
Fax: (416) 466-9629
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2867 Ellesmere Road - 12th floor
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: (416) 281-7476
Fax: (416) 281-7313
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karoon Carole Danayan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 05 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Danayan ( CPSO# 81007 )

Business Address:
Suite 100
235 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 1N2
Phone Number: (416) 466-1311

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Road
12th Floor
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 281-7476

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 14 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAROON CAROLE DANAYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANAYAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2009