Danby, Michelle Christine (CPSO#: 92892)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1240 Commissioners Road West
Unit 103
London ON  N6K 1C7
Phone: (519) 472-4343
Fax: 519-472-0103
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michelle Danby Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Danby ( CPSO# 92892 )

Business Address:
Suite 103
1240 Commissioners Road West
London ON  N6K 1C7
Phone Number: (519) 472-4343

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE CHRISTINE DANBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANBY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014