Dang, Tommy Tue Minh (CPSO#: 72481)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Oct 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Oct 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1030 Ouellette Avenue
OR Department
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4411
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1995 Lens Avenue
OR Department
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Canada
Phone: (519) 973-4411
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tommy T. M. Dang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 07 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Dang ( CPSO# 72481 )

Business Address:
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4411

Business Address:
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 973-4411

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 24 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TOMMY TUE MINH DANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 07 Mar 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Mar 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Oct 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2005

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: September 30, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)