Dang, Yen Kinh (CPSO#: 84413)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 May 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 May 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
25 Cumberland Street
Cornwall ON  K6J 4G8
Phone: (613) 938-2552
Fax: (613) 938-2559
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dang-Lemire Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 19 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lemire ( CPSO# 84485 )
Dr. Y. Dang ( CPSO# 84413 )

Business Address:
25 Cumberland Street
Cornwall ON  K6J 4G8
Phone Number: (613) 938-2552

Business Address:
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone Number: (613) 938-4240

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YEN KINH DANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 2012