Danial, Sarah Badar (CPSO#: 65770)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Names: Danial-Iqbal, Sarah Badar (used until: 02 Feb 1997 )     Danial, Sarah Badar (used until: 27 Feb 1995 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 2
5668 Main Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2G 5Z4
Phone: (905) 357-2360
Fax: (905) 357-4714
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

5662 Main Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2G 7W9
Canada
Phone: 905-357-2360
Fax: 905-357-4714
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. B. Danial Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 17 2009

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Kentucky

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH BADAR DANIAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANIAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Aug 2000
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1992