Daniel, Ariadne d'Argenson (CPSO#: 92189)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Daniel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 10 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 20 Oct 2009 to 08 Nov 2009
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Nov 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Aug 2015