Daniel, Shevanta Gihan (CPSO#: 91051)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:People's Friendship University of Russia, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Parkwood Medical Centre
Unit F1-1
1265 York Mills Rd
Toronto ON  M3A 1Z4
Phone: (416) 342-0670
Fax: (416) 293-5214
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1755, Brimley road
Toronto ON  M1P 0A3
Canada
Phone: (416) 290-0361
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S.G. Daniel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Daniel ( CPSO# 91051 )

Business Address:
Parkwood Medical Centre
Unit F1-1
1265 York Mills Road
Toronto ON  M3A 1Z4
Phone Number: (416) 342-0670

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHEVANTA GIHAN DANIEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANIEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 21 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 22 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011