Darani, Shaheen Alicia (CPSO#: 75313)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C A M H
Forensic Division
Unit 3-4
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 32984
Fax: (416) 583-4319
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shaheen Darani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Darani ( CPSO# 75313 )

Business Address:
C A M H
Law and Mental Health Program
Unit 3-4
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Forensic Psychiatry Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAHEEN ALICIA DARANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DARANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2006