Darley, David Ross (CPSO#: 113332)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 2017

Expiry Date:  08 Jul 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 23 Sep 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of New South Wales, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Respiratory Medicine
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ROSS DARLEY may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. DARLEY is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. DARLEY shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. DARLEY is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. DARLEY shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. DARLEY ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. DARLEY ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 08 Jul 2018.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 Jul 2017 to 22 Sep 2017
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 15 Sep 2018
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 Jul 2018