Dart, Allison Brie (CPSO#: 77498)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 20 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 24 Dec 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Aug 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2016