Darvish-Kazem, Saeed (CPSO#: 92800)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10 Cottrelle Boulevard
Unit 205
Brampton ON  L6S 0E2
Phone: 905-497-7747
Fax: 905-497-7748
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Darvish-Kazem Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Darvish-Kazem ( CPSO# 92800 )

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
McMaster Clinic
Room 511
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (289) 439-1788

Business Address:
205-10 Cottrelle Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6S 0E1
Phone Number: (905) 497-7747

Business Address:
109-311 Commercial Street
Milton ON  L9T 3Z9
Phone Number: (905) 878-9805

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 18 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAEED DARVISH-KAZEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DARVISH-KAZEM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2014