Darwish Hassan, Ahmed Abd El Magid (CPSO#: 94522)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 14 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Cairo, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2010 to 21 Jan 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 22 Jan 2011 to 31 Oct 2011
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2011 to 31 Oct 2012
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 14 Aug 2013
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Aug 2013