Darwish, Husam Hussain Mohammed (CPSO#: 79136)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 20 May 2003 to 24 Jun 2003
PEAP - Resident - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 25 Jun 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 27 May 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008