Das, Jennifer Lea (CPSO#: 93358)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Nov 2017

Summary

Former Name: Davis, Jennifer Lea (used until: 28 Jul 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Thomas Jefferson University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kindercare Pediatrics
301-491 Eglinton Ave W
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone: (416) 848-766
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul Das Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Das ( CPSO# 93381 )
Dr. J. Das ( CPSO# 93358 )

Business Address:
Health Centre at 80 Bond
80 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1X2
Phone Number: (416) 864-3011

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
301-491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone Number: (416) 848-7665

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER LEA DAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Developmental Paediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Developmental Paediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 15 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Developmental Paediatrics

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Developmental Paediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 28 Feb 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Developmental Paediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2017