Das, Lopamudra (CPSO#: 95741)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kindercare Pediatrics
491 Eglinton Avenue West Unit 301
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone: 416-848-7665
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 24 Dec 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LOPAMUDRA DAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 24 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 25 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 24 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2015