Das, Pavani Reddy (CPSO#: 94444)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 24 Sep 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northwestern University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Gw 33
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6130
Fax: (416) 756-6449
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Oct 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 24 Sep 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Feb 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Jul 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 18 Jul 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Nov 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 03 Nov 2015 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Pavani Reddy Das may practise:

                  (i)   medicine independently in infectious diseases;
                  
                        AND

                  (ii)  internal  medicine  at  North  York General Hospital in North York,
                        Ontario,  while  under  supervision  coordinated  by  a  supervisor
                        acceptable to the College. 
                  
            2.    The authority to practise in clause  1(ii) automatically expires upon the
                  following   events,  unless  the  Registration   Committee   renews   the
                  certificate with  or  without  additional  or other terms, conditions and
                  limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor notifies the College of  any  concerns regarding Dr.
                        Das' knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does  not  provide the
                        required  reports to the College by the due date or if the  reports
                        are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Das' practice, or
                  
                  (iii) Dr. Das is no longer enrolled in the Change of Scope Program, or
                  
                  (iv)  the  College finds the assessment report, pertaining to the on-site
                        assessment of Dr. Das' practice unsatisfactory.