Das, Sumit Kumar (CPSO#: 91927)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Ross University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neuropathology Effective: 21 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2009 to 24 Oct 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Oct 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2010 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2011 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neuropathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2014