Dasgupta, Anusua Roshni (CPSO#: 79534)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 01 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 6 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 7 - Pediatric General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2006