Dasgupta, Monidipa (CPSO#: 71983)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Feb 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Feb 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, French

Education:McGill University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Hospital
Geriatric Medicine
Room B9-103
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 33922#
Fax: (519) 663-3472
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dasgupta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dasgupta ( CPSO# 71983 )

Business Address:
University Hospital
Geriatric Medicine
339 Windermere Road
Room B9-103
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
Parkwood Institute
550 Wellington Road South
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Jan 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 21 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MONIDIPA DASGUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DASGUPTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Sep 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 May 1999
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Feb 2000 to 31 Jan 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2001