Daskalopoulos, Rina (CPSO#: 84299)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 203
316 King Street East
Cobourg ON  K9A 5R8
Phone: (905) 373-1280
Fax: (905) 373-9335
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rina Daskalopoulos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 26 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Daskalopoulos ( CPSO# 84299 )

Business Address:
66 Dorset Street East
Port Hope ON  L1A 1E3
Phone Number: (905) 885-4558

Business Address:
1000 Depalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone Number: (905) 372-6811

Business Address:
Unit 203
316 King Street East
Cobourg ON  K9A 5R8
Phone Number: (905) 373-1280

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RINA DASKALOPOULOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DASKALOPOULOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008