Dass, Philippe Daniel (CPSO#: 89140)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 751-5544
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Philippe Dass Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 18 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Dass ( CPSO# 89140 )

Business Address:
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5544

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 03 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILIPPE DANIEL DASS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DASS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 20 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 21 Jul 2011 to 20 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 21 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014