Datt, Ghansham Dharry (CPSO#: 75857)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 21 Jan 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Jan 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of the West Indies, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 21 Jan 2002
Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Jan 2002