Datta, Suvomoy (CPSO#: 75129)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, French

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Datta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 4 2009

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 17 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUVOMOY DATTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DATTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2002