Dauksza, Aneta Janina (CPSO#: 71646)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Aug 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
210 Centrum Blvd
Suit 101
Orleans ON  K1E 3V7
Phone: (613) 837-5454
Fax: (613) 837-3781
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

770 Broadview Ave
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Canada
Phone: 613-729-9463
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aneta Dauksza Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dauksza ( CPSO# 71646 )

Business Address:
210 Centrum Boulevard
Orleans ON  K1E 3V7
Phone Number: (613) 837-5454

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANETA JANINA DAUKSZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAUKSZA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1999