Davey, Cecile Delaine (CPSO#: 78502)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 May 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 May 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Jamaican Creole

Education:University of the West Indies, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

525 Belmont Avenue West
Suite 105
Kitchener ON  N2M 5E2
Canada
Phone: (519) 569-7700
Fax: (519) 569-7722
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Cecile D. Davey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Davey ( CPSO# 78502 )

Business Address:
Suite 105
525 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5E2
Phone Number: (519) 569-7711

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Jamaica

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CECILE DELAINE DAVEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2002 to 31 Aug 2003
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2003 to 01 Sep 2004
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2005 to 31 Jan 2006
International Specialist Physician - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 May 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Aug 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Aug 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 May 2011