Davidson, Lindsay Kathleen (CPSO#: 57267)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Feb 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
449 Princess St
Kingston, ON
K7L 1C2
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 536-3092
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L.K. Davidson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Davidson ( CPSO# 57267 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Victory 3
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 544-9626

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-9616

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDSAY KATHLEEN DAVIDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIDSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 1988