Davidson, Meredith Clare (CPSO#: 96229)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: West Parry Sound 6 Albert Street Parry Sound, ON P2A 3A4
Date Received: 09 Jul 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jul 2015