Davie, Wendy Hoa Ai (CPSO#: 93415)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bayside Medical Centre
3 Beck Boulevard
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 1B9
Phone: (705) 549-3939
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WENDY HOA AI DAVIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 11 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Mar 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2013